+ − Actions (55)
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment amended
- Co-author authorized
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On March 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On November 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate