+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/13/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor