+ − Actions (51)
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On November 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor