+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Health
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor