+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Point of order overruled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Laid out as postponed business
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
- Read first time
On January 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate