+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor