+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/25/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate