+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (79)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/13
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Record vote
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House passage as amended reported
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor