+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor