+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/23/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/25/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/21/2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate