+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor