+ − Actions (10)
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor