+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate