+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 22, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/21/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate