+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Education
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate