+ − Actions (41)
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Major State Calendar
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor