+ − Actions (51)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Rules suspended
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor