+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (78)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
- Senate refuses to concur
- Senate requests conference committee
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/13/2019
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/30/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor