+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Co-author authorized
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/2/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor