+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/11
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Meeting cancelled
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On December 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate