+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/14/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor