+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate