+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Administration
- Read first time
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/2/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor