+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate