+ − Actions (29)
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor