+ − Actions (77)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On June 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- House adopts conference committee report
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor