+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendations filed with the Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/16/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor