+ − Actions (46)
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor