+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/12/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor