+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remarks ordered printed
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Higher Education
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Remarks ordered printed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor