+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Three day rule suspended
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On December 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (92)
Type:
Primary Sponsor