+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate