+ − Actions (39)
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor