+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On May 19, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/4/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor