+ − Actions (34)
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to International Relations and Trade
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor