+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendations filed with the Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor