+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Recommendations filed with the Senate
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor