+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Public Health
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/10/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor