+ − Actions (29)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce
- Read first time
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to International Relations and Trade
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor