+ − Actions (42)
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Laid out in lieu of companion
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor