+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 3rd time
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Point of order withdrawn
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/11/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/27/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Texas Ports, Select
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate