+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Record vote
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/19/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate