+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Public Education Funding by Chair
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor