+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to State Affairs
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/15/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate