+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Reported engrossed
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/3/2021
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor