+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (62)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/11
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Passed
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor