+ − Actions (30)
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as amended
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate