+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (174)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- House grants request for conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate refuses to concur
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amended
- Motion to table fails
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Motion to table fails
- Point of order overruled (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment amended
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Motion to table fails
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Motion to table fails
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate