+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor