+ − Actions (31)
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On November 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor